Financial history PURITON PLAYING FIELD COMMITTEE

Charity Number: 296549
Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.94k £40.82k £33.35k £35.23k £64.76k
Total expenditure £36.60k £22.31k £23.09k £49.42k £82.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.73k £18.56k £2.89k £1.45k