Trustees BRITISH NATURALISTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 296551

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Joseph Guymer | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Jones | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Vivienne Louisa Holt | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Endymion Beer | Trustee | 24 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dudley | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Rutherford FBNA | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roy Leslie Stewart | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Charles Gibson | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CURWEN | Trustee | 06 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RICHARD DEMIDECKI-DEMIDOWICZ | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.