MAKE Southwest

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKE Southwest is dedicated to enriching lives through Making and Craft. As an education charity it engages with communities and young people to provide learning opportunities through outreach, exhibitions, and workshops. For Makers it offers professional development, help with reducing environmental impact and showcasing their work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £174,749 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 April 1987: Standard registration
- DEVON GUILD OF CRAFTSMEN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Shortland-Potter | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Camilla Hampshire | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
David Andrew Alcock | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Woods | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ashton-Marie Sutcliffe | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
MICHAEL DAVID LEA | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Gillian Greenwood | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Deane | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew North | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £450.21k | £353.55k | £455.32k | £382.96k | £451.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £485.24k | £272.17k | £369.02k | £423.81k | £430.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.56k | £170.65k | £232.47k | £158.35k | £174.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30/04/94, 29/04/95, 02/0598, 29/11/03, 21/01/04, 13/05/06 AND 17/05/08. ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 2 JUNE 2010. as amended on 03 Nov 2020 as amended on 22 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF CRAFTS BOTH ANCIENT AND MODERN, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE CRAFTSMANSHIP AND FOSTER, PROMOTE AND INCREASE THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN PARTICULARLY IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON BUT TO INCLUDE THOSE FROM OTHER COUNTIES, PARTICULARLY CORNWALL, SOMERSET AND DORSET, WILTSHIRE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE ISLES OF SCILLY.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAKE Southwest
RIVERSIDE MILL
FORE STREET
BOVEY TRACEY
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 9AF
- Phone:
- 01626832223
- Email:
- hello@crafts.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window