SANE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising awareness and campaigning to combat stigma surrounding mental illness and to improve mental health services Providing emotional support and specialist services through its helpline SANEline open 365 evenings a year, Email service, Textcare and Online Forum Promoting and hosting research into the causes of mental illness and effectiveness of treatments and therapies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,077,296
Donations and legacies | £1.69m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £10.07k | |
Investments | £51.53k | |
Other | £323.98k |
Total expenditure:
£1,467,252
Raising funds | £255.99k | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other | £107.60k |
£549,071 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £363.59k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m | |
Retained for future use | £610.04k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £363.59k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.10m | |
Retained for future use | £1.16m |
People

25 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1987: Standard registration
- SANELINE (Working name)
- S A N E (SCHIZOPHRENIA A NATIONAL EMERGENCY) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA RUSSELL HON | Chair | 25 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Brewer | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor James Hunter MacCabe | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|||||
PROF DINESH KUMAR BHUGRA | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVISON | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CROCKET BOWIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT ANTHONY MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37m | £1.59m | £1.18m | £930.65k | £2.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35m | £1.15m | £1.28m | £1.35m | £1.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.08m | £997.36k | £853.81k | £822.01k | £1.69m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £17.75k | £0 | £0 | £10.07k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.02k | £0 | £10.97k | £7.12k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £15.76k | £254.89k | £93.55k | £0 | £51.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £270.05k | £316.53k | £221.02k | £134.94k | £323.98k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.33m | £257.65k | £319.78k | £273.22k | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.12m | £898.23k | £865.30k | £867.57k | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £222.19k | £233.27k | £379.31k | £437.66k | £255.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k | £76.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.68k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £13.09k | £21.00k | £31.16k | £47.01k | £107.60k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.07m | £1.07m | £1.32m | £1.07m | £1.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £995.89k | £1.24m | £1.07m | £1.27m | £1.82m | |
|
Other assets | £2.00m | £2.14m | £1.92m | £1.54m | £1.60m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £153.82k | £97.18k | £52.58k | £53.14k | £47.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14TH MAY 1992, 30TH MARCH 1995 AND 15TH OCTOBER 1997.
Charitable objects
(I) THE UNDERTAKING OR ASSISTING IN THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS AND THE PUBLISHING OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (II) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK ESPECIALLY PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS BY PROVIDING OR PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT OF CARE AND TREATMENT AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS DECIDE AND THE PREVENTION OF SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS (III) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS (IV) THE RELIEF OF RELATIVES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS AND OTHERS AFFECTED BY THEIR ACTIONS WHO ARE IN NEED AND DISTRESS (V) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SCHIZOPHRENIA AND OTHER MENTAL ILLNESSES AND CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE AND BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MENTAL ILLNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SANE
St. Marks Studios
14 Chillingworth Road
Islington
London
N7 8QJ
- Phone:
- 02038051756
- Email:
- vperera@sane.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window