Financial history THE GREGGS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 296590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.89m £3.31m £4.52m £5.71m £6.43m
Total expenditure £3.63m £4.02m £4.12m £5.21m £6.07m
Income from government contracts £680.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £680.00k £333.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.30m £2.61m £3.54m £4.61m £5.05m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £268.68k £402.85k £424.71k £531.55k £601.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £319.63k £302.16k £556.19k £566.42k £781.68k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.16m £4.01m £4.10m £5.20m £6.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.11k £14.58k £22.09k £12.40k £8.27k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £400.93k £19.44k £24.25k £94.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.14m £1.92m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £463.25k £0 £0 £0 £0