BASILDON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School-related fund-raising in support of Basildon CE Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 15 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caireen Reed | Chair | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joao Pedro da Fonseca Pereira | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Fleetwood | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.92k | £9.40k | £6.28k | £20.16k | £12.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.18k | £4.66k | £1.33k | £13.95k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE PRIMARY SCHOOL AT UPPER BASILDON BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
UPPER BASILDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basildon C of E Primary School
School Lane
Upper Basildon
Reading
RG8 8PD
- Phone:
- 01491671445
- Email:
- bsa@basildonprimary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window