ALL SAINTS CARSHALTON PARENT TEACHERASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AS A SUPPORT STRUCTURE TO THE SCHOOL MANAGEMENT, AND A FUND RAISER FOR SPECFIC CAPITAL PROJECTS. AS A SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY GROUP WITHIN THE SCHOOL AND THE WIDER BUSINESS COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 11 June 1987: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS' CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ALL SAINTS' CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Theresa Cassell | Chair | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Stanley | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian David George Simpson | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Emmett | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.07k | £19.45k | £10.77k | £13.35k | £18.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.29k | £19.83k | £14.24k | £9.45k | £15.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/09/1986 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1993 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROTHERFIELD ROAD
CARSHALTON
SM5 3DW
- Phone:
- 02084010075
- Email:
- asptainfo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window