Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF AMUDEI TORAH

Charity number: 296647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 05 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 May 2025 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 April 2025 520 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 April 2025 885 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days