Financial history FRIENDS OF AMUDEI TORAH

Charity number: 296647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.50k £9.40k £4.81k £13.00k £5.51k
Total expenditure £19.97k £9.63k £5.84k £10.69k £9.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A