THE DYMPNA CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pastoral & Spiritual Counselling, for clergy and Church people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- North Yorkshire
- Wigan
Governance
- 13 May 1987: Standard registration
- 26 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 26 August 2022: Funds transferred to 234926 MISSIONARIES OF SAINT FRANCIS DE SALES
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.70k | £35.06k | £23.15k | £9.00k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.83k | £29.77k | £18.80k | £11.21k | £12.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 18 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 June 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH APRIL 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN PROMOTING AND ADVANCING RELIGION AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS AND SPIRITUAL STUDIES OF THE PHSYCHOLOGICAL AND SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window