ST GEORGES SCHOOL BOURTON PARENTS AND TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING FOR THE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 24 April 1987: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE'S SCHOOL BOURTON PTFA (Working name)
- BOURTON SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- BOURTON SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ST GEORGES SCHOOL BOURTON PARENTS AND TEACERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Sarah O'Brien | Chair | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Brady | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RIA JENNIFER CAINES | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.22k | £3.62k | £4.36k | £6.39k | £10.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £6.19k | £3.09k | £9.58k | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 September 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING EXTRA EQUIPMETN ETC AND TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOURTON (VC) PRIMARY SCHOOL
CHURCH TRACK
BOURTON
GILLINGHAM
DORSET
SP8 5BN
- Phone:
- 01747840409
- Email:
- office@bourton.dorset.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window