INTERNATIONAL MASONRY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With members throughout the world, the Society is a focus for all aspects of masonry. It produces the journal, Masonry International, 3 times a year, containing original technical papers, reviews and research, with other publications issued from time to time and organises meetings including a quadrennial International Masonry Conference
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 April 1987: Standard registration
- BRITISH MASONRY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN WILLIAM LEONARD | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor STEPHEN WILLIAM Garrity | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL PIERRE ROGATZKI | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOHN JAMES ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NEIL EDWARD BENINGFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANTON NEVILLE FRIED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GEOFFREY JOHN EDGELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY ALBERT HASELTINE MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ADRIAN JUDE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CLIFFORD ALAN FUDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN FERGUSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CECIL HAYNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.15k | £18.38k | £18.93k | £15.98k | £16.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.29k | £16.85k | £15.91k | £8.09k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 16TH JUNE 1986 CONSTITUTION 4TH JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 24TH JULY 1989 AND 26 JUNE 1998, AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
3.1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF DISCUSSION AND ELUCIDATION OF THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF MASONRY INCLUDING THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ITS CONSTITUENT MATERIALS, THE AESTHETIC, ENGINEERING, CONSTRUCTIONAL DESIGN AND THE BUILDING AND SUPERVISION OF STRUCTURES AND FORMS AND THE BEHAVIOUR OF THE MATERIALS IN USE, FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING UNDERSTANDING OF THE PERFORMANCE OF THE MATERIAL TO THE BENEFIT OF MANUFACTURERS, PRACTITIONERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN PROVIDING A MORE LASTING, AESTHETICALLY PLEASING, HEALTHY AND SOCIALLY DESIRABLE LIVING ENVIRONMENT. 3.2) FOR THOSE PURPOSES TO PROVIDE MEANS FOR BRINGING INTO CONTACT AND ASSOCIATION THOSE ENGAGED IN MASONRY SCIENCE, DESIGN AND INDUSTRY AND LIKEWISE TO RECEIVE, EDIT, PRINT AND PUBLISH PAPERS AND OTHER LITERARY UNDERTAKINGS AND TO FORM OR MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OF MASONRY AND ALLIED LITERATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 WIDECOMBE ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 6SL
- Phone:
- 01782279051
- Email:
- philip.e.wood@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window