THE TRINITARIAN SPIRITUAL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE TRINITARIAN SPIRITUAL BAPTIST FAITH AND ITS INSTITUTIONS IN THE EXISTING AND OTHER PARISH AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 24 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP J A HIBBERT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cassita Hibbert | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Celine Hibbert | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
AARON HIBBERT | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.49k | £13.02k | £10.03k | £13.43k | £14.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.35k | £18.40k | £11.79k | £12.37k | £13.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 May 2023 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF CHARITY ARE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO PROMOTE THE TRINITARIAN SPIRITUAL BAPTIST FAITH AND ITS INSTITUTIONS IN THE EXISTING AND OTHER PARISH AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT EXPAND AND DEVELOP THE CHURCH AND ITS FACILITIES FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinitarian Spiritual Baptist Church
138 Church Walk
LONDON
N16 8QQ
- Phone:
- 02088895632
- Email:
- TSBCH@MAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window