Accounts and annual returns SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND ACADEMIES TRUST IN ADMINISTRATION

Charity number: 296729
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 26 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 11 February 2010 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time