Financial history SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND ACADEMIES TRUST IN ADMINISTRATION

Charity number: 296729
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £39.56m £50.21m £61.83m £86.98m £91.01m
Total expenditure £38.56m £49.89m £59.94m £87.83m £88.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.72m £0 £1.15m £1.22m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £1.29m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £48.15m £60.06m £84.92m £89.66m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £337.00k £482.00k £388.00k £43.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £340.00k £90.00k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £48.54m £58.62m £86.49m £87.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £109.00k £99.00k £230.00k £282.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0