OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting with the educational purposes of museums etc in Oxfordshire including promoting cooperation,training and fund raising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 May 1987: Standard registration
- OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS ADVISORY COUNCIL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MATTHEW TOWNSEND | Chair |
|
||||||
Marita Ann Middleton | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Elin Bornemann | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Anne Anderson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.70k | £1.70k | £3.45k | £2.45k | £2.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.42k | £2.24k | £2.63k | £2.39k | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 29 OCTOBER 1993, 20 OCTOBER 1999, 17 MAY 2007 AND 21 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS : THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COUNCIL IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) ASSISTING WITH THE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OF MUSEUMS, ART GALLERIES OR COLLECTIONS WHICH ARE SITUATE OR WHICH OPERATE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE AND WHICH ARE OPEN ON A REGULAR BASIS TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE (SUCH MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES BEING HEREINAFTER TOGETHER CALLED "OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS") BY PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROMOTION OF IMPROVEMENTS IN THE ORGANISATION OF AND THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS AND GENERALLY IN THE QUALITY OF OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS AND BY FOSTERING THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS BY THE PUBLIC. (II) ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING IN PROMOTING CO-OPERATION BETWEEN MUSEUM INTERESTS AND CO-ORDINATION OF MUSEUM ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY INCLUDING LIAISON AS NECESSARY WITH SUCH OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND BODIES INCLUDING REGIONAL AND NATIONAL BODIES AS APPROPRIATE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (III) SEEKING GENERAL FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GRANT-AID FROM THOSE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE EMPOWERED TO ASSIST MUSEUMS BY PROVIDING GRANT-AID TO PROMOTE THEIR ACTIVITIES. (IV) SEEKING FUNDS FROM THE MEMBER BODIES AND ELSEWHERE TO PROVIDE SUPPORTING FINANCE IN RESPECT OF GRANT-AID REQUIRING A CONTRIBUTION FROM RECIPIENTS OF AWARDS. (V) ENCOURAGING THE FORMATION OF GROUPS OF FRIENDS ASSOCIATED WITH INDIVIDUAL MUSEUMS OR A CONSORTIUM OF MUSEUMS FOR THE PURPOSE OF VOLUNTARY ASSISTANCE WITH THEIR FINANCIAL AND OTHER NEEDS. (VI) FACILITATING TRAINING SO AS TO ASSIST OXFORDSHIRE MUSEUMS IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Banbury Museum
Castle Quay
Spiceball Park Road
BANBURY
OX16 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01295753752
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window