Cottenham and Rampton Lunch and Social Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a meeting place for the elderly to meet with coffee, a lunch and activities, including additional occasional coach outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 June 1987: Standard registration
- COTTENHAM DAY CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Brown | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judy Garstang | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Smith | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Leonard | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sharpe | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Olivia Fuller | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mynott | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alice Gough | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Pilbeam | Trustee | 02 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £3.37k | £1.81k | £9.22k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.90k | £3.95k | £3.17k | £8.25k | £7.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH JANUARY 1987 as amended on 31 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISHES OF COTTENHAM, RAMPTON AND LANDBEACH.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF COTTENHAM, RAMPTON AND LANDBEACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Millfield
Cottenham
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 8RA
- Phone:
- 07708 425720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window