WEST MALLING CHURCH FABRIC FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The repair, maintenance and renewal of the tower, roof and main walls and other structural parts of the fabric of St Mary the Virgin Church, West Malling, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
Governance
- 28 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Innes | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jeffrey Neil Griffiths | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
JOHN MICHAEL DENNY | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DAVID GREEN | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £637 | £1.35k | £1.82k | £467 | £657 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £934 | £0 | £3.23k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH APRIL 1987
Charitable objects
REPAIRS, MAINTENANCE AND RENEWAL OF THE FABRIC OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN CHURCH, WEST MALLING AND THE CHURCH CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WEST MALLING, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
138 HIGH STREET
WEST MALLING
ME19 6NE
- Phone:
- 01732842245
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window