Governing document THE FRIENDS OF HAZEL COURT SCHOOL
Charity Number: 296760

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 14TH MARCH 1988, 26TH MARCH 1992, 27TH MAY 2002 AND 7 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE DISABILITIES OF THE PUPILS AND STUDENTS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CATCHMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.