LOUND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage and maintain a village hall, a village green, and some allotments for the benefit of local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Hargadon | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Day | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Page | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Larcombe | Trustee | 02 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RITA FLATT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.94k | £17.36k | £7.22k | £12.22k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | £5.54k | £7.37k | £23.81k | £8.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2025 | 735 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 14TH NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LOUND IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, AS A PUBLIC BOWLING GREEN AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LOUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Church Lane
Lound
LOWESTOFT
NR32 5LL
- Phone:
- 01502731321
- Email:
- info@loundvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window