Financial history FRIENDS OF THE REDFERN CENTRE

Charity number: 296814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.29k £13.02k £15.34k £24.71k £18.18k
Total expenditure £17.53k £16.45k £10.40k £12.29k £4.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £786 £755