FRIENDS OF THE REDFERN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supply equipment and assist with a transport service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £755 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 15 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Fice | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
christine turner | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
jan carter | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
susan dobson | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
pam hincklieff | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
eve barrett | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
maureen hutchings | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
raymond clive parsons | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
chris turns | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penny Reed | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hiscock | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.29k | £13.02k | £15.34k | £24.71k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.53k | £16.45k | £10.40k | £12.29k | £4.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £786 | £755 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH APRIL 1987 as amended on 19 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021 as amended on 17 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNIT SERVED BY THE REDFERN HEALTH CENTRE SALCOMBE BY ASSISTING THOSE WHO ARE SICK DISABLED HANIDCAPPED INFIRM ELDERLY OR OTHERWISE UNDER THE CARE OF THE CENTRE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT AND EXTEND THE LEVEL OF PRIMARY HEALTH CARE PROVIDED BY THE CENTRE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beacon Cottage
Hope Cove
KINGSBRIDGE
Devon
TQ7 3HY
- Phone:
- 07815810808
- Email:
- sramsden2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
salcombehealthcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window