Governing document FRIENDS OF THE REDFERN CENTRE
Charity number: 296814

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH APRIL 1987 as amended on 19 Nov 2020 as amended on 18 Nov 2021 as amended on 17 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNIT SERVED BY THE REDFERN HEALTH CENTRE SALCOMBE BY ASSISTING THOSE WHO ARE SICK DISABLED HANIDCAPPED INFIRM ELDERLY OR OTHERWISE UNDER THE CARE OF THE CENTRE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT AND EXTEND THE LEVEL OF PRIMARY HEALTH CARE PROVIDED BY THE CENTRE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEE OBJECT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.