Financial history LAVENDON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (LSA)

Charity number: 296830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/07/2020 19/07/2021 19/07/2022 19/07/2023 19/07/2024
Total gross income £8.57k £5.58k £8.26k £9.46k £12.64k
Total expenditure £6.31k £5.64k £9.70k £7.75k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A