HOME START BANBURY AND CHIPPING NORTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 June 1987: Standard registration
- 19 June 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 June 2008: Funds transferred to 1114860 HOME-START BANBURY & CHIPPING NORTON
- BANBURY HOME START (Previous name)
- HOME START BANBURY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.50k | £94.93k | £92.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.96k | £80.36k | £94.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 18 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 29 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 15 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 15 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH DECEMBER 1986 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 21 SEPTEMBER 1992, AS AMENDED 10 JUNE 1997 AND 9 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN, (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN, (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF BANBURY , NORTH AND NORTH-WEST OXFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
BANBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window