THE PUDDLE LANE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and suffering and the advancement of education anywhere in the world and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) to promote the well-being of children and of disabled people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MICHAEL MCCULLAGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROBERT EDWARD DUGDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARK JOHN PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY MARGARET MCCULLAGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £0 | £12.20k | £30.50k | £50.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10TH MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN AND OF DISABLED PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9A BEECH AVENUE
BREASTON
DERBY
DE72 3BJ
- Phone:
- 01332874103
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window