THE ALMA ROAD SURGERY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises money for GP surgery in Romsey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Butler | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clark | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jane Coral Heyer | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cox | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bull | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bonner | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186 | £50 | £338 | £871 | £149 | |
|
Total expenditure | £813 | £0 | £0 | £2.43k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/04/1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF THE ALMA ROAD SURGERY ROMSEY IN HAMPSHIRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FACILITIES SERVICES AND SUPPORT SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES FOR AND THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTH CARE OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES PROVIDED THE MEANS REMAIN LEGALLY CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fern Bank
Church Lane
Awbridge
ROMSEY
SO51 0HN
- Phone:
- 01794341923
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window