SOUTHAMPTON CHILDMINDERS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support and training to childminders to assist the Early Years Development team in maintaining high quality childcare provision within Southampton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 04 June 1987: Standard registration
- 27 June 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SCMA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.78k | £15.75k | £14.62k | £5.07k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.56k | £14.18k | £13.51k | £7.24k | £4.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 30 March 2011 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 March 2011 | 415 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 25 August 2009 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 25 August 2009 | 206 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1987 AND AMENDED ON 18TH MARCH 1992 AND AMENDED ON 23 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND TO PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 5 YEARS AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECT OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUATION OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window