Financial history CHARNDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £12.77k £2.51k £2.94k £10.53k £10.30k
Total expenditure £4.34k £5.08k £6.09k £6.50k £7.25k
Income from government contracts £188 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A