THE WORMWOOD SCRUBS CHARITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 June 1987: Standard registration
- 13 December 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 13TH MAY 1987
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR INSTITUTIONS OR ANY INDIVIDUAL OR INDIVIDUALS AS THE ASSOCIATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT BY MEANS OF MAKING GRANTS THERETO OUT OF THE FUNDS RAISED BY THE VOLUNTARY EFFORTS OF CONVICTED AND REMAND PRISONERS FROM TIME TO TIME HELD AT H.M.P. WORMWOOD SCRUBS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window