FRIENDS OF THE ONCOLOGY AND RADIOTHERAPY CENTRE EXETER (FORCE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FORCE is a Westcountry cancer charity dedicated to assisting local cancer patients and their families. FORCE provides patient support at our purpose build centre, funds a local research programme and purchases "state fo the art" equipment for local cancer treatment centres. The charity was incorporated in 2011 and now operates as FORCE Cancer Charity reg no 1140676.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 27 May 1987: Standard registration
- FORCE CANCER CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jennifer Forrest | Chair | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Worthington | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Sally Kidner | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Frank Andre Malcolm Cook | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE HONG | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN RENNINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 1ST APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10TH JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR CANCER RESEARCH OF A CLINICAL NATURE IN EXETER, DEVON. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
DEVON, CORNWALL, SOMERSET AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
F O R C E CANCER CHARITY
CORNER HOUSE
BARRACK ROAD
EXETER
EX2 5DW
- Phone:
- 01392402875
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window