THE ALBERT VAN DEN BERGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All our donations are donor directed, supporting a wide area of charities and voluntary organisiations throughout the UK. We favour Cornwall, Sussex and Surrey based groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 June 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamsin Barrett | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Edlin Webster | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET HARTLEY DL | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICOLA GLOVER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.13k | £142.52k | £124.25k | £100.81k | £82.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.69k | £191.76k | £269.68k | £181.14k | £162.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST APRIL 1987
Charitable objects
THE APPLICATION OF THE INCOME OF THE SETTLED PROPERTY AND THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL THEREOF AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THER DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEESSHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING CONTAINED HEREIN SHALL AUTHORISE THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND OR THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS AFORESAD SAVE THOSE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREVORNICK FARM
HOLYWELL BAY
NEWQUAY
TR8 5PW
- Phone:
- 01637 830272
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window