Financial history THE SOUTHAMPTON MOSQUE TRUST

Charity number: 296904
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £133.68k £106.65k £141.93k £122.58k £133.04k
Total expenditure £97.18k £84.77k £93.50k £102.92k £147.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £43.86k £15.91k N/A N/A