KINGDOWN SCHOOL PTA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingdown School PTA works to raise funds to purchase the 'extras' which cannot be afforded within the educational budget, but which enhance school life for pupils and teachers alike. They also aim to foster good relations between the school and the wider community, and act as a 'sounding board' for the head teacher.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 June 1987: Standard registration
- 27 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KINGDOWN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (PTA) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.91k | £12.93k | £12.14k | £12.40k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61k | £12.58k | £16.66k | £15.32k | £6.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 25 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 03 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 08 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 15 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 24 June 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT KINGDOWN SCHOOL, WARMINSTER, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHEMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window