Trustees ENTERPRISE SWIMMING CLUB FOR DISABLED PEOPLE - CROYDON
Charity Number: 296927

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BROOKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ZUFILKA MEHERUN ISAAC | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA DE WARREN EVANS | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geeva Naidoo | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SASTRIE NAIDOO | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEREK EVANS | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE TAYLOR | Trustee | 14 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN TAYLOR | Trustee | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.