Financial history THE HENLEY FESTIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 296965
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £2.21m £1.99m £2.32m £2.46m £2.63m
Total expenditure £2.10m £2.17m £2.20m £3.04m £2.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £359.50k £340.34k
Income - Other trading activities £290.54k £249.72k £247.01k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £1.73m £2.07m £2.09m £2.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.63k £5.87k £2.54k £5.19k £1.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.06m £2.15m £2.46m £3.04m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £37.13k £18.83k -£263.74k £40.85k £49.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.11k £55.00k £0 £0 £5.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £484.00k