GUILDFORD AREA UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guildford Area U3a organises in excess of 100 groups for persons retired or semi-retired. For an annual donation members are able to attend groups in Art,Crafts,Discussion,Drama,Games,Health Fitness & Leisure,History Languages, Literature, Music, Research and the Sciences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 June 1987: Standard registration
- U3A GUILDFORD AREA (Previous name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE GUILDFORD (U3A) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Cohen | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sharp | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Harris | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kundert | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Clements | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Layton | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY FRANCES WATSON | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira MacQuaide | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justin Jackson MA,MBCS | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Philo | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Ring | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH ROBERTSON | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.53k | £49.77k | £98.55k | £84.03k | £102.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.03k | £17.33k | £90.74k | £83.95k | £105.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED 20TH DECEMBER 1995, 28TH OCTOBER 1997 AND 25TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN GUILDFORD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guildford Area u3a
PO Box 1631
Guildford
- Phone:
- 01483 323631
- Website:
-
guildfordu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window