Accounts and annual returns LORD AND LADY LURGAN TRUST

Charity number: 297046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 November 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required