C R BURRELL'S CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 297061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £37,504
Total expenditure: £62,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • C R BURRELLI CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE COWDRAY TRUST LIMITED Trustee 27 May 1987
COWDRAY PENSIONS TRUST
Received: On time
DUNECHT PENSIONS TRUST
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE LADY A J BURRELL'S CHARITY TRUST NO 2
Received: On time
MRS SMILEY'S SECOND CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE HON MRS H D LAKIN'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
LADY MCCORQUODALE'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MRS V M TRITTON'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MRS GREENWOOD'S 1984 CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
W K GIBSON'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
ROSANNA PEARSON'S 1987 CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MR H M T GIBSON'S CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
HON CHARLES PEARSON CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MIDHURST PENSIONS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.51m £404.33k £13.70k £22.66k £37.50k
Total expenditure £15.21k £43.81k £230.42k £129.69k £62.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.50m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £6.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £1.50m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £145 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £145 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4th Floor
7 Swallow Street
LONDON
W1B 4DE
Phone:
02079072100
Website:

No information available