Trustees LEWISHAM YOUTH THEATRE LTD

Charity Number: 297075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Genine Whitehorne Chair 09 February 2016
None on record
Alice Yinghua Chen Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Louise Gordon Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Tyreke Andrew Leslie Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Freneka Mumford Trustee 25 March 2022
None on record
JAMEIL THOMAS Trustee 03 October 2012
None on record