Financial history MANOR OF NEWLAND LODGE CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 297093
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £3.12k £2.30k £2.59k £2.71k £1.99k
Total expenditure £2.24k £700 £1.15k £2.81k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A