THE CATHOLIC THEOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold annual conference and provide a forum for contact between Catholic theologians in Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 September 1987: Standard registration
- CATHOLIC THEOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- CTAGB (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Martin Murray | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Clemence Power | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen McKinney | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.77k | £6.51k | £5.50k | £6.80k | £6.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £735 | £4.07k | £2.07k | £4.15k | £5.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 December 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THEOLOGY ND INPARTICULAR OF THE DOCTRINES AND TENETS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKFRIARS PRIORY
ST. GILES
OXFORD
OX1 3LY
- Phone:
- 07725839914
- Email:
- maria.power@bfriars.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window