THE NEIGHBOUR DISPUTE MEDIATION SCHEME LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the public benefit throughout London the provision of services directed towards mediation & conciliation between persons, organisations & groups who are involved in disputes arising from interpersonal conflict or unlawful activity. To advance the education of the public in methods of such mediation & conciliation & the means of managing it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £52,004 from 3 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 July 1987: Standard registration
- 09 June 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 June 2022: Funds transferred to 1161807 CALM MEDIATION
- SOUTHWARK MEDIATION CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.28k | £244.96k | £178.06k | £160.28k | £178.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.27k | £222.56k | £213.44k | £158.27k | £206.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.00k | £40.00k | £21.81k | N/A | £52.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £52.42k | £5.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MARCH 1986 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 APRIL 1987, 27 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTE OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICT WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK IN METHODS OF SUCH MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF SUCH DISPUTE AND MEANS OF MANAGING IT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window