THE COTTESLOE CHARITABLE TRUST.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants to registered charities principally but not exclusively in Buckinghamshire. The charity is involved in organising varying events to raise funds, all of which are then distributed to the local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 17 August 1987: Standard registration
- LORD COTTESLOE'S CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE LORD LIEUTENANT OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE'S CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BETSY DUNCAN SMITH | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES STANLEY | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.74k | £962 | £24.92k | £55.52k | £98.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.59k | £7.68k | £25.11k | £56.07k | £66.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/06/1987 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS (WHETHER AN INDIVIDUAL OR INDIVIDUALLY OR OTHERWISE) IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swanbourne Estate Office
Home Farm
Winslow Road
Swanbourne
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 0SW
- Phone:
- 01296720256
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window