MENDLESHAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School for childen aged 2 to 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Total income includes £58,852 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 July 1987: Standard registration
- MENDLESHAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marnie O'Hare | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jordan | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.12k | £60.05k | £61.90k | £91.24k | £67.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.79k | £57.50k | £59.99k | £81.86k | £71.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £49.02k | £43.77k | £53.14k | £58.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1060 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1060 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1425 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1425 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1790 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1790 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHIC PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SMALL COMMUNITY HALL
OLD STATION ROAD
MENDLESHAM
STOWMARKET
IP14 5RT
- Phone:
- 01449766041
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window