Financial history BRITISH EDUCATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY

Charity number: 297241
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £35.93m £33.62m £38.71m £61.61m £80.42m
Total expenditure £36.35m £33.63m £37.32m £60.79m £115.30m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £30.27m £38.39m £61.55m £80.39m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £3.28m £225.49k £0 £27.00k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £62.74k £86.13k £60.00k £1.00k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £33.55m £38.74m £60.41m £114.73m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £113.53k £108.88k £241.00k £194.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £608.93k £3.96m £13.91m £58.74m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A -£33.13k -£1.52m £138.00k £385.00k