THE WREN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wren works with people and music to educate about and through traditional music, song and history
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 March 1988: Standard registration
- 02 July 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 July 2009: Funds transferred to 1128790 WREN MUSIC
- WREN MUSIC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.32k | £197.90k | £238.41k | £216.46k | £274.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.28k | £223.52k | £236.36k | £242.81k | £278.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 06 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 21 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 13 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 16 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 12 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 February 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 21 February 2005 | 21 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 30TH JUNE 1987, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 24 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND FOSTERING THE UNDERSTANDING, KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF FOLKLORE MUSIC AND ITS ASSOCIATED ARTISTIC FORMS AND OF FOLKLORE TRADITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window