THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, BLAKENEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help improve, maintain, repair, renew and preserve the fabric, fixtures, fittings, furniture and equipment of the Church (St Nicholas Blakeney) and the churchyard for the benifit of the Public. To help maintain and develop the music and other aspects of worship and the life of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 July 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE JARDINE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Seana Broom | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey George Alexander | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Dalton Bent | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joan Deidre Cymraeg | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS QUINTIN GREEN | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.39k | £3.19k | £3.11k | £5.87k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £2.32k | £4.34k | £6.23k | £670 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
1}TO IMPROVE,MAINTAIN,REPAIR,RENEW & PRESERVE THE FABRIC FIXTURES,FITTINGS,FURNITURE & EQUIPMENT OF THE CHURCH & THE CHURCHYARD OF ST NICHOLAS'CHURCH,BLAKENEY,FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.2}TO MAINTAIN & DEVELOP THE MUSIC & OTHER ASPECT OF WORSHIP & THE LIFE OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTISE BLAKENEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
119A High Street
Blakeney
HOLT
NR25 7NU
- Phone:
- 01263741054
- Email:
- seana@taxworx.co.uk
- Website:
-
n.a
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window