Financial history ABINGER COMMON VILLAGE HALL (EVELYN HALL)

Charity Number: 297282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.76k £16.89k £19.06k £22.38k £15.84k
Total expenditure £9.78k £12.44k £22.47k £19.91k £17.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k £4.67k N/A