Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTH ESSEX GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 297322
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2009 22 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 10 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2008 04 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 10 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 31 January 2008 On Time